Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Department Of Family And Protective Services, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Finley, Troy, Finley, Kimmy Blair, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts 382nd District Court with Hall, Brett presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
CategorySupport Order - Iv-D |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court House382nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Placement Review Order | |
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Deputy Reporter Statement | |
November 04, 2016 | Docket Event | CASA | |
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Report | |
June 01, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER TO PAY APPOINTED ATTORNEY | |
May 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Note | |
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Review Hearing (OCA) | |
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Permanency Hearing Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.