Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Waite, Tristan Kyle, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Goolsby, Jakala Shae, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts 251st District Court with Ana E. Estevez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAna E. Estevez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 12, 2024 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedApril 06, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House251st District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
COUNTER PETITION IN SUIT AFFECTING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP IN SUIT AFFECTING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP |
|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
ANSWER ATTY JOSH WOODBURN FOR JAKALA ATTY JOSH WOODBURN FOR JAKALA |
|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
TRO SERVED/UNSERVED SERVED - JAKALA - 4/01/24 SERVED - JAKALA - 4/01/24 |
|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED JAKALA - 4/01/24 JAKALA - 4/01/24 |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
ISSUED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER JAKALA - EFILED TO ATTY JAKALA - EFILED TO ATTY |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED JAKALA - EFILED TO ATTY JAKALA - EFILED TO ATTY |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS - APRIL 4, 2024 AT 9:00 AM AND ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS - APRIL 4, 2024 AT 9:00 AM |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER NOTICE OF COURT PROCEEDING - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ NOTICE OF COURT PROCEEDING - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.