Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Texas Attorney General Child Support Division, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 1.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 13, 2024 |
Category(Title Iv-D Oag Use Only)Establishment |
Last RefreshedApril 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 1 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Zoom on 4/15: all appeared, nonsuit announced Zoom on 4/15: all appeared, nonsuit announced |
|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Fowler, Jeremy) | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED-AG MCKIENZEE-2-24-24-RCSO MCKIENZEE-2-24-24-RCSO |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED-AG JOSEPH-2-20-24-RCSO JOSEPH-2-20-24-RCSO |
|
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event | CITATION-AG SCOCCIMARO, JOSEPH FRANCIS Served 02/20/2024 | |
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event | CITATION-AG MOORE, MCKIENZEE TAYLOR Served 02/24/2024 | |
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED-AG MCKIENZEE-RCSO MCKIENZEE-RCSO |
|
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED-AG JOSEPH-RCSO JOSEPH-RCSO |
|
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.