Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Texas Attorney General, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 1.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2024 |
Category(Title Iv-D Oag Use Only)Establishment |
Last RefreshedApril 12, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 1 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
ORDER AFFECTING PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP - DEFAULT (OCA) SIGNED 04/12/2024 25 PGS SIGNED 04/12/2024 25 PGS |
|
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Order signed, JF Order signed, JF |
|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN MAILING ADDRESS OF HUNTER OF HUNTER |
|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED IN SUIT AFFECTING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP-SENT TO JUDGE FOWLER PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED IN SUIT AFFECTING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP-SENT TO JUDGE FOWLER |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Zoom: Ms. Persefield pro se sworn and testified, Mr. Glover served FTA; default order rendered, JFowler Associate Judge Zoom: Ms. Persefield pro se sworn and testified, Mr. Glover served FTA; default order rendered, JFowler Associate Judge |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Fowler, Jeremy) | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Zoom: Ms. Persefield pro se sworn and testified, Mr. Glover served FTA; default order rendered, JFowler Associate Judge Zoom: Ms. Persefield pro se sworn and testified, Mr. Glover served FTA; default order rendered, JFowler Associate Judge |
|
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED-AG HUNTER-02-14-24-RCSO HUNTER-02-14-24-RCSO |
|
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED-AG SUMMER-2-14-24-RCSO SUMMER-2-14-24-RCSO |
|
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event | CITATION-AG PERSEFIELD, SUMMER RAYNE Served 02/14/2024 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.