Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Texas Department Of Family And Protective Services, filed a(n) Child Protection - Family case against Rodriguez, Cecilia, Salinas, Juan Antonio, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 1.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 05, 2024 |
CategoryChild Protective Services |
Last RefreshedMarch 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Protection |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 1 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
INITIAL PERMANENCY HERAING ORDER BEOFRE FINAL ORDER - MAY 20, 2024 AT 9:00 AM VIA ZOOM PERMANENCY HERAING ORDER BEOFRE FINAL ORDER - MAY 20, 2024 AT 9:00 AM VIA ZOOM |
|
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER APPROVING ATTORNEY FEES - HILL - 3/25/2024 - SENT TO JUDGE GRAHAM APPROVING ATTORNEY FEES - HILL - 3/25/2024 - SENT TO JUDGE GRAHAM |
|
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Graham, Jack) | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Initial Permanency: Department continued TMC, placement continued. Ordered no contact between children and Father without prior court order. Ordered Juan IV be evaluated for autism when appropriate. Initial Permanency: Department continued TMC, placement continued. Ordered no contact between children and Father without prior court order. Ordered Juan IV be evaluated for autism when appropriate. |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPROVING ATTORNEY FEES HILL - $300 - SENT TO AUDITOR HILL - $300 - SENT TO AUDITOR |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
PERMANENCY REPORT TO THE COURT TEMPORARY MANAGING CONSERVATORSHIP - MARCH 25, 2024 AT 9:00 AM TEMPORARY MANAGING CONSERVATORSHIP - MARCH 25, 2024 AT 9:00 AM |
|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Motion Hearing: Court finds Father has subjected children to Aggravated Circumstances pursuant to TFC, Sec. 262.2015 (b) (3) (I) by endangering the children. Court waives the requirement that Department create a service plan for Father and make reasonable efforts to return the children to Father' Motion Hearing: Court finds Father has subjected children to Aggravated Circumstances pursuant to TFC, Sec. 262.2015 (b) (3) (I) by endangering the children. Court waives the requirement that Department create a service plan for Father and make reasonable efforts to return the children to Father' |
|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON MOTION TO FIND AGGRAVATED CIRCUMSTANCES PURSUANT TO TEXAS FAMILY CODE SECTION 262.2015 - MARCH 25, 2024 AT 2:30PM ON MOTION TO FIND AGGRAVATED CIRCUMSTANCES PURSUANT TO TEXAS FAMILY CODE SECTION 262.2015 - MARCH 25, 2024 AT 2:30PM |
|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA SERVED COLBY HALL, IR 24-0501887 COLBY HALL, IR 24-0501887 |
|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER APPROVING ATTORNEY FEES - HILL - 3/18/2024 - SENT TO JUDGE GRAHAM APPROVING ATTORNEY FEES - HILL - 3/18/2024 - SENT TO JUDGE GRAHAM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.