Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Castillo, Ada, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Standley, Mark Amba, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts 251st District Court with Ana E. Estevez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAna E. Estevez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2024 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedApril 14, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House251st District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Barbara Younger, C.S.R. , Petitioner and attorney Erin Mulanax appeared. Respondent and attorney Mark Standley appeared. Announced agreement as to property. Continued with Ada Castillo. Barbara Younger, C.S.R. , Petitioner and attorney Erin Mulanax appeared. Respondent and attorney Mark Standley appeared. Announced agreement as to property. Continued with Ada Castillo. |
|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
ORDER RESETTING HEARING ON TEMPORARY ORDERS AND RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS - APRIL 12, 2024 AT 11:00 AM ON TEMPORARY ORDERS AND RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS - APRIL 12, 2024 AT 11:00 AM |
|
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER RESETTING HEARING ON TEMPORARY ORDERS AND RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ RESETTING HEARING ON TEMPORARY ORDERS AND RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
UNSIGNED ORDER (RETURNED BY JUDGE) THE COURT WILL BE IN POTTER COUNTY ON 4/12. PLEASE SEND OUT A NEW NOTICE OF HEARING WITH THE CORRECT LOCATION - OSH ON TEMPORARY ORDERS AND REPSONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COURT WILL BE IN POTTER COUNTY ON 4/12. PLEASE SEND OUT A NEW NOTICE OF HEARING WITH THE CORRECT LOCATION - OSH ON TEMPORARY ORDERS AND REPSONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) 02/15/2024 Reset by Court to 03/22/2024 | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER ORDER RESETTING HEARING ON TEMPORARY ORDERS AND RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ ORDER RESETTING HEARING ON TEMPORARY ORDERS AND RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Barbara Younger, C.S.R. , Petitioner and attorney Erin Mulanax appeared. Respondent and attorney Mark Standley appeared. Argued motion to dismiss. Respondent called Mark Standley - sworn and testified. Respondent called Nicole Campbell (10:21 a.m.) - sworn and testified. Respondent called Jerry Garcia (10:25 a.m.) - sworn and testified. Petitioner called Ada Castillo - sworn and testified. will continue hearing. Husband to have exclusive use of the residence. All other temporary orders denied. Barbara Younger, C.S.R. , Petitioner and attorney Erin Mulanax appeared. Respondent and attorney Mark Standley appeared. Argued motion to dismiss. Respondent called Mark Standley - sworn and testified. Respondent called Nicole Campbell (10:21 a.m.) - sworn and testified. Respondent called Jerry Garcia (10:25 a.m.) - sworn and testified. Petitioner called Ada Castillo - sworn and testified. will continue hearing. Husband to have exclusive use of the residence. All other temporary orders denied. |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY DIRECTED TO RESPONDENT DIRECTED TO RESPONDENT |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Other Certificate of Written Discovery Certificate of Written Discovery |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.