Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Peachtree Settlement Funding Llc, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Julie Pi Evans, against Name Redacted, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Ana E. Estevez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2023 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedJanuary 20, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING **UNREDACTED** AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER, NOTICE OF PRPOSED TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED ANNUITY PAYMENTS, AND NOTICE OF DEADLINE FOR RESPONSES TO APPLICATION **UNREDACTED** AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER, NOTICE OF PRPOSED TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED ANNUITY PAYMENTS, AND NOTICE OF DEADLINE FOR RESPONSES TO APPLICATION |
|
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING **REDACTED** AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER, NOTICE OF PRPOSED TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED ANNUITY PAYMENTS, AND NOTICE OF DEADLINE FOR RESPONSES TO APPLICATION **REDACTED** AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER, NOTICE OF PRPOSED TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED ANNUITY PAYMENTS, AND NOTICE OF DEADLINE FOR RESPONSES TO APPLICATION |
|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Structured Settlement (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER FINAL ORDER APPROVING TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS - REDACTED - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ FINAL ORDER APPROVING TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS - REDACTED - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER FINAL ORDER APPROVING TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS - UNREDACTED - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ FINAL ORDER APPROVING TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS - UNREDACTED - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER, NOTICE OF PROPOSED TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED ANNUITY PAYMENTS, AND NOTICE OF DEADLINE FOR RESPONSES TO APPLICATION - JANUARY 18, 2024 AT 1:30 PM ON APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER, NOTICE OF PROPOSED TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED ANNUITY PAYMENTS, AND NOTICE OF DEADLINE FOR RESPONSES TO APPLICATION - JANUARY 18, 2024 AT 1:30 PM |
|
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL SCHEDULE REVIEW-18 Months |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.