Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
20230930-Dk-Butterfly-1, Inc. Formerly Known As Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc., filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Melinda D. Blackwell, against Potter-Randall Appraisal District, represented by Kyle Dickson, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2023 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 25, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
ANSWER KYLE DICKSON ATTY FOR POTTER-RANDALL APPRAISAL KYLE DICKSON ATTY FOR POTTER-RANDALL APPRAISAL |
|
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED POTTER-RANDALL APPRAISAL DISTRICT - 12/04/23 POTTER-RANDALL APPRAISAL DISTRICT - 12/04/23 |
|
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation POTTER-RANDALL APPRAISAL DISTRICT Served 12/04/2023 | |
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED POTTER RANDALL APPRAISAL DISTRICT - RCSO POTTER RANDALL APPRAISAL DISTRICT - RCSO |
|
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation POTTER-RANDALL APPRAISAL DISTRICT Unserved | |
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE | |
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL SCHEDULE REVIEW-18 Months | |
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITION Petition | |
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
APPLICATION Request for Issuance of Citation & Service Request for Issuance of Citation & Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.