Case Last Refreshed: 2 days ago
Texas Department Of Family And Protective Services, filed a(n) Child Protection - Family case against Casias, Ignacia, Rodriguez, Jonathan, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 2.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 27, 2022 |
CategoryChild Protective Services |
Last RefreshedMay 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Protection |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 2 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Graham, Jack) | |
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | FAMILY PLAN OF SERVICE & AGREEMENT | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
PERMANENCY REPORT TO THE COURT - TEMPORARY MANAGING CONSERVATORSHIP - APRIL 29, 2024 - TEMPORARY MANAGING CONSERVATORSHIP - APRIL 29, 2024 |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
FAMILY PLAN OF SERVICE & AGREEMENT JONATHAN RODRIGUEZ JONATHAN RODRIGUEZ |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
FAMILY PLAN OF SERVICE & AGREEMENT IGNACIA CASIAS IGNACIA CASIAS |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE TRANSFER CERTIFICATE - TRANSFERRED FROM GRAY COUNTY CASE #40754 TRANSFER CERTIFICATE - TRANSFERRED FROM GRAY COUNTY CASE #40754 |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
DOCKET SHEET TRANSFERRED FROM GRAY COUNTY TRANSFERRED FROM GRAY COUNTY |
|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO TRANSFER TO C/C AT LAW GRAY COUNTY ORDERED TO TRANSFER TO THIS CAUSE - SIGNED 2/20/2024 - 4 PGS GRAY COUNTY ORDERED TO TRANSFER TO THIS CAUSE - SIGNED 2/20/2024 - 4 PGS |
|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
TRANSFER ORDER TRANSFERRED FROM GRAY COUNTY TRANSFERRED FROM GRAY COUNTY |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER TRANSFERRING SUIT AFFECTING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP FROM COURT OF CONTINUING EXCLUSIVE JURISDICTION - SENT TO JUDGE GRAHAM TRANSFERRING SUIT AFFECTING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP FROM COURT OF CONTINUING EXCLUSIVE JURISDICTION - SENT TO JUDGE GRAHAM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.