Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago
Fowler, Scott Eugene, Fowler, Victoria Priesley, filed a(n) Adoption - Family case against Brake, Landen Gage, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts 181st District Court with Titiana D. Frausto presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 14, 2023 |
CategoryAdoption |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeAdoption |
Filing Court House181st District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING ADOPTION (OCA) 5 PGS - SIGNED ON 4/1/2024 5 PGS - SIGNED ON 4/1/2024 |
|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF TERMINATION 5 PGS - SIGNED ON 4/1/2024 5 PGS - SIGNED ON 4/1/2024 |
|
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Case called; Ps appeared with counsel and announced ready; testimony and evidence received; court finds by clear and convincing evidence that termination of R-Father's parental rights is in the best interest of the child; parent rights terminated; Adoption granted; Lisa Thrash, CSR. Case called; Ps appeared with counsel and announced ready; testimony and evidence received; court finds by clear and convincing evidence that termination of R-Father's parental rights is in the best interest of the child; parent rights terminated; Adoption granted; Lisa Thrash, CSR. |
|
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Frausto, Titiana) IN POTTER COUNTY- 501 S. FILLMORE ST., STE 4B, AMARILLO, TEXAS IN POTTER COUNTY- 501 S. FILLMORE ST., STE 4B, AMARILLO, TEXAS |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT CONCERNING INTERSTATE COMPACT CONCERNING INTERSTATE COMPACT |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT FOR VOLUNTARY RELINQUISHMENT OF PARENTAL RIGHTS LANDEN GAGE BRAKE LANDEN GAGE BRAKE |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
CRIMINAL HISTORY REPORT SCOTT FOWLER SCOTT FOWLER |
|
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING APRIL 1, 2024 AT 1:30 PM APRIL 1, 2024 AT 1:30 PM |
|
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED ORDER SETTING HEARING - SENT TO JUDGE FRAUSTO PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED ORDER SETTING HEARING - SENT TO JUDGE FRAUSTO |
|
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
AMENDED FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR TERMINATION AND ADOPTION OF STEPCHILD FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR TERMINATION AND ADOPTION OF STEPCHILD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.