Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gipson, Jimmy, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Kent Canada, against Bank Of America, represented by Steven L. Hoard, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 15, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL (TO US DISTRICT COURT) FEDERAL COURT FEDERAL COURT |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED BANK OF AMERICA - 5/21/2021 BANK OF AMERICA - 5/21/2021 |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT (from Post Office) | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED BANK OF AMERICA - CMS BANK OF AMERICA - CMS |
|
May 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
May 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL SCHEDULE REVIEW-18 Months |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.