Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Jerry F. DeMelo, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 08, 1989 |
CategoryFamily Support |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Minute Order - Off Calendar
Judge: DeMelo, J.F., Jr. |
|
April 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: DeMelo, J.F., Jr. |
|
March 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Gov)
Judge: DeMelo, J.F., Jr. |
|
February 01, 2006 | Docket Event | Abstract of Support Judgment | |
November 28, 2005 | Docket Event | Abstract of Support Judgment | |
December 13, 2002 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment & Proof of Service by Mail | |
December 05, 2002 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order (after 7/1/97)
Judge: DeMelo, J.F., Jr. |
|
November 07, 2002 | Docket Event | Abstract of Support Judgment | |
September 27, 2002 | Docket Event | Abstract of Support Judgment | |
October 16, 1990 | Docket Event |
Judg Est Parental Rel & C/S
Judge: DeMelo, J.F., Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.