Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Goldsmith, Ryan, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Sealy, Telissa, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with John B. Board presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn B. Board Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2019 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Divorce (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Board, John B) | |
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry Parties named JMC with Resp. having right to est. primary residence of child within RC, PC, and Gray County. Petitioner awarded SPO with elections. CS = $550.00 per month begin 10/15/20. Parties will each be liable for fifty percent of amounts owed for previous lease agreements. Parties named JMC with Resp. having right to est. primary residence of child within RC, PC, and Gray County. Petitioner awarded SPO with elections. CS = $550.00 per month begin 10/15/20. Parties will each be liable for fifty percent of amounts owed for previous lease agreements. |
|
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO JUDGE BOARD FROM RANDY BRAIDFOOT RE: MEDIATION TO JUDGE BOARD FROM RANDY BRAIDFOOT RE: MEDIATION |
|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO JUDGE RE: FINAL HEARING DATE - 5/21/2020 AT 9:00 AM TO JUDGE RE: FINAL HEARING DATE - 5/21/2020 AT 9:00 AM |
|
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR REFERRAL TO MEDIATION | |
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Temporary Order (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Anderson, James, Anderson, James) | |
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
ANSWER RESPONDENT'S AND COUNTER-PETITION - APRIL PALMER RESPONDENT'S AND COUNTER-PETITION - APRIL PALMER |
|
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL APRIL PALMER FOR TELISSA SEALY APRIL PALMER FOR TELISSA SEALY |
|
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER TEMPORARY MODIFIED POSSESSION ORDER - 11 PGS - SIGNED ON 10/23/2019 TEMPORARY MODIFIED POSSESSION ORDER - 11 PGS - SIGNED ON 10/23/2019 |
|
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED AGREED ORDERS - SENT TO JUDGE BOARD PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED AGREED ORDERS - SENT TO JUDGE BOARD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.