Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hargues, Lester Dean, Hargues, Kayla Rose, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Slaughter, Lonnie Ray, Crane, Lisa Rene, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Ana E. Estevez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAna E. Estevez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 24, 2018 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE LET/RETURNED LONNIE RAY SLAUGHTER, SR LONNIE RAY SLAUGHTER, SR |
|
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE TO VAAVIA EDWARDS, LISA CRANE, AND LONNIE RAY SLAUGHTER, SR TO VAAVIA EDWARDS, LISA CRANE, AND LONNIE RAY SLAUGHTER, SR |
|
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER AFFECTING PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP (OCA) SIGNED 12/11/18, 25 PGS SIGNED 12/11/18, 25 PGS |
|
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry Barbara Younger, C.S.R., Petitioners and attorney Vaavia Edwards appeared. Respondents did not appear and wholly made default. Petitioner called Kayla Hargues - sworn and testified. Petitioner called Lester Hargues - sworn and testified. JMC. No c/s. supervised visits as agreed. Order signed. Barbara Younger, C.S.R., Petitioners and attorney Vaavia Edwards appeared. Respondents did not appear and wholly made default. Petitioner called Kayla Hargues - sworn and testified. Petitioner called Lester Hargues - sworn and testified. JMC. No c/s. supervised visits as agreed. Order signed. |
|
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event | SUITE AFFECTING PARENT/CHILD RELATIONSHIP (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
October 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED TO LONNIE 10/2/18 TO LONNIE 10/2/18 |
|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED TO LISA, 10/3/18 TO LISA, 10/3/18 |
|
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED TO LISA, EFILED BACK TO ATTORNEY TO LISA, EFILED BACK TO ATTORNEY |
|
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED TO LONNIE, EFILED BACK TO ATTORNEY TO LONNIE, EFILED BACK TO ATTORNEY |
|
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE LONNIE LONNIE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.