Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Freedom Bail Bonds filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Ana E. Estevez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 30, 2018 |
CategoryBond Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE LET/RETURNED MARIA MURRAY MARIA MURRAY |
|
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE TO MARIA MURRAY, INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INS. AND FREEDOM BAIL BONDS TO MARIA MURRAY, INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INS. AND FREEDOM BAIL BONDS |
|
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
BILL OF COST SENT TO INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INS. AND FREEDOM BAIL BONDS SENT TO INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INS. AND FREEDOM BAIL BONDS |
|
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
AGREED JUDGMENT (OCA) SIGNED 6/27/19, 1 PG SIGNED 6/27/19, 1 PG |
|
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER AGREED JUDGMENT, SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ AGREED JUDGMENT, SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 8/26/19 AT 11AM 8/26/19 AT 11AM |
|
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 6/24/19 AT 9AM 6/24/19 AT 9AM |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY PERRY PEEK PERRY PEEK |
|
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL | |
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER ORDER TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL, SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ ORDER TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL, SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.