Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Galaviz, Eliasar, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Galaviz, Natalia Edith, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with John B. Board presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 08, 2018 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | CITATION ISSUED | |
August 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
CITATION PUBLICATION FILE IN PAPER FILE IN PAPER |
|
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE Vol./Book TO ELIASAR GALAVIZ ON 7-30-18 Vol./Book TO ELIASAR GALAVIZ ON 7-30-18 |
|
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Pro Se Divorce (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Board, John B) | |
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
DECREE OF DIVORCE - DEFAULT (OCA) 6 PAGES SIGNED ON 7-26-18 6 PAGES SIGNED ON 7-26-18 |
|
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
AMENDED PETITION FOR DIVORCE FOR DIVORCE |
|
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit for Citation by Publication | |
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event | PRO SE ADVISEMENT AND INFO (of party filing) | |
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.