Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Minnett, Stacy Leigh, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Minnett, John Wolfgang, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2010 |
CategoryAll Other Family Law Matters |
Last RefreshedMarch 15, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Fowler, Jeremy) | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Zoom: all parties appeared, ratified agreement, Atty signatureonly, OAG Blackburn, JFowler Zoom: all parties appeared, ratified agreement, Atty signatureonly, OAG Blackburn, JFowler |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
ZOOM - ORDER SETTING HEARING 3-13-24 @ 2:30 PM 3-13-24 @ 2:30 PM |
|
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED ORDER SETTING HEARING-SENT TO JUDGE FOWLER PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED ORDER SETTING HEARING-SENT TO JUDGE FOWLER |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Zoom: agreed reset, mother appeared and told of date Zoom: agreed reset, mother appeared and told of date |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Fowler, Jeremy) | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED JOHN-1-2-24-GRAY JOHN-1-2-24-GRAY |
|
December 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
ISSUED PRECEPT- AG JOHN MINNETT - GRAY CO JOHN MINNETT - GRAY CO |
|
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.