Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Taxing Districts Collected By Randall County, Randall County, Et Al, Randall County Et Al, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by William C. Pinkham, against Moreau, Lodena, Moreau, Donald, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with John B. Board presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2019 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event | DISTRIBUTION OF MONEYS - off Order of Sale | |
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT ~ copy of receipt - $8.00 court costs rec'd ~ copy of receipt - $8.00 court costs rec'd |
|
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Filed Order of Sale | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | ISSUED ORDER OF SALE | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice MOREAU, DONALD Served 05/14/2020 | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
REQUEST ORDER OF SALE ORDER OF SALE |
|
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | MAILED NOTICE | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Value from Tax Office EXHIBIT 2 EXHIBIT 2 |
|
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN MAILING ADDRESS | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certification of Delinquent Tax Records EXHIBIT 1 EXHIBIT 1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.