Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Hotchkiss, Angela Denise, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Todd, Shain Levi, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts 47th District Court with Dee Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2017 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House47th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Final Divorce (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Johnson, Dee) TO BE HEARD IN POTTER COUNTY, SUBJECT TO JURY TRIAL TO BE HEARD IN POTTER COUNTY, SUBJECT TO JURY TRIAL |
|
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Docket Calls (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Johnson, Dee) | |
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING MAY 16, 2024 AT 1:30 PM MAY 16, 2024 AT 1:30 PM |
|
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED NOTICE OF COURT PROCEEDING - SENT TO JUDGE JOHNSON PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED NOTICE OF COURT PROCEEDING - SENT TO JUDGE JOHNSON |
|
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED ORDER ON MOTION TO ENTER AGREED TEMPORARY ORDERS FOR MODIFICATION IN PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP - SENT TO JUDGE JOHNSON PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED ORDER ON MOTION TO ENTER AGREED TEMPORARY ORDERS FOR MODIFICATION IN PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP - SENT TO JUDGE JOHNSON |
|
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO ENTER AGREED TEMPORARY ORDERS FOR MODIFICATION OF PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP TO ENTER AGREED TEMPORARY ORDERS FOR MODIFICATION OF PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP |
|
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Both parents appeared with counsel for T.O. Child interviewed by court with court reporter present. Parties will remain JMC with mom determining residence. Education determined jointly. No discussion of litigation with child. App Close to be used for calendaring but does not have to be exclusive. Visitation for dad will be as was done informally prior to hearing and relative to his work schedule. Mom will make sure child not walking home from school. Otherwise, no other modifications at this time. Both parents appeared with counsel for T.O. Child interviewed by court with court reporter present. Parties will remain JMC with mom determining residence. Education determined jointly. No discussion of litigation with child. App Close to be used for calendaring but does not have to be exclusive. Visitation for dad will be as was done informally prior to hearing and relative to his work schedule. Mom will make sure child not walking home from school. Otherwise, no other modifications at this time. |
|
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Temporary Order (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Johnson, Dee) | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
AMENDED COUNTER-PETITION TO MODIFY PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP COUNTER-PETITION TO MODIFY PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP |
|
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
COUNTER PETITION TO MODIFY PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP - CLAIRE GRAMMER TO MODIFY PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP - CLAIRE GRAMMER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.