Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Brandt Engineers Group, Ltd., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Shawn David Twing, against West Amarillo Mhc, Llc, Amarillo Mhc, Llc, represented by Timothy C Williams, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Titiana D. Frausto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTitiana D. Frausto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 27, 2017 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedJune 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Frausto, Titiana) | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE EFILED TO ATTYS EFILED TO ATTYS |
|
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF NONSUIT (OCA) 1 PG - SIGNED ON 4/28/2021 1 PG - SIGNED ON 4/28/2021 |
|
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NONSUIT JOINT JOINT |
|
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED ORDER GRANTING NON-SUIT OF CLAIMS - SENT TO JUDGE FRAUSTO PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED ORDER GRANTING NON-SUIT OF CLAIMS - SENT TO JUDGE FRAUSTO |
|
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Board, John B) | |
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION OF MARY ELLEN BRANDT - 8/13/2019 OF MARY ELLEN BRANDT - 8/13/2019 |
|
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S PLAINTIFF'S |
|
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS AND ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS AND ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS |
|
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED CHARGE OF THE COURT - SENT TO JUDGE BOARD ON 9-4-19 PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED CHARGE OF THE COURT - SENT TO JUDGE BOARD ON 9-4-19 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.