Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Saunders, Melody, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Saunders, Robert, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with John B. Board presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 24, 2017 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
PRECEPT SERVED ROBERT SAUNDERS - 7/16/2020 ROBERT SAUNDERS - 7/16/2020 |
|
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
ISSUED PRECEPT ROBERT SAUNDERS - EFILED TO ATTY ROBERT SAUNDERS - EFILED TO ATTY |
|
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE | |
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO ENTER QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER - BROUGHT BY MELODY SAUNDERS - ATTY DAVID BRADLEY TO ENTER QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER - BROUGHT BY MELODY SAUNDERS - ATTY DAVID BRADLEY |
|
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Post-Judgment Actions - Modifications - Other (OCA) | |
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGMENT FROM SDU FROM SDU |
|
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
EMPLOYER LETTER W/W AMR-AMS 3408 AIRWAY BLVD AMARILLO, TX 79118 AMR-AMS 3408 AIRWAY BLVD AMARILLO, TX 79118 |
|
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE E-FILED TO DAVID BRADLEY AND VAAVIA EDWARDS E-FILED TO DAVID BRADLEY AND VAAVIA EDWARDS |
|
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
DECREE OF DIVORCE - AGREED (OCA) 04/17/18, 34 PAGES 04/17/18, 34 PAGES |
|
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry Petitioner appeared with counsel; sworn testimony taken. Divorce granted as shown in agreed Decree. RD, by Assignment Petitioner appeared with counsel; sworn testimony taken. Divorce granted as shown in agreed Decree. RD, by Assignment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.