Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Valdez, Abreanna, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Moncada, Valentin, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Ana E. Estevez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAna E. Estevez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 21, 2017 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
May 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
TEMPORARY ORDERS IN SUIT AFFECTING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP IN SUIT AFFECTING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP |
|
May 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officers Anderson, James, Anderson - CC, James) | |
May 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED TO VALENTIN MONCADA-5/2/17 TO VALENTIN MONCADA-5/2/17 |
|
May 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
TRO SERVED/UNSERVED TO VALENTIN MONCADA 5/2/17 TO VALENTIN MONCADA 5/2/17 |
|
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER TEMPORARY ORDERS-SENT TO JUDGE ANDERSON TEMPORARY ORDERS-SENT TO JUDGE ANDERSON |
|
April 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
ISSUE CITATION & TRO SETTING HEARING (Family Matters) TO VALENTIN MONCADA-EFILED BACK TO ATTORNEY TO VALENTIN MONCADA-EFILED BACK TO ATTORNEY |
|
April 24, 2017 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER | |
April 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF CITATION FOR ISSUANCE OF CITATION |
|
April 21, 2017 | Docket Event | FAMILY SCHEDULE REVIEW-9 Months |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.