Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Wilmington Savings Fund Society, Fsb, Citifinancial Servicing, Llc, As Trustee Of Stanwich Mortgage Loan Trust, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Anthony R Sassi, Keith A. Taylor, against Wheeler, Timothy Lee, Wheeler, Russell James, Wheeler, Ricky L., Wheeler, Lloyd L., Wheeler, Jeffrey Paul, (total of 8) See All represented by Kay Pechin, David M. Russell, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Ana E. Estevez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAna E. Estevez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 08, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE LET/RETURNED RETURN TO SENDER/COULDN'T BE DELIVERED AS ADDRESSED RETURN TO SENDER/COULDN'T BE DELIVERED AS ADDRESSED |
|
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE LET/RETURNED RETURN TO SENDER/VACANT - NO FORWARDING ADDRESS RETURN TO SENDER/VACANT - NO FORWARDING ADDRESS |
|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE LET/RETURNED COULD NOT BE DELIVERED AS ADDRESSED - **VACANT** COULD NOT BE DELIVERED AS ADDRESSED - **VACANT** |
|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPROVING ATTORNEY FEES 3 PAGES SIGNED ON 10-8-2020 TO BE PAID BY PLAINTIFF 3 PAGES SIGNED ON 10-8-2020 TO BE PAID BY PLAINTIFF |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE E-FILED TO ATTORNEYS E-FILED TO ATTORNEYS |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE TO CLIFTON WAYNE WHEELER, TIMOTHY LEE WHEELER, JEFFREY PAUL WHEELER, AND RICKY L. WHEELER TO CLIFTON WAYNE WHEELER, TIMOTHY LEE WHEELER, JEFFREY PAUL WHEELER, AND RICKY L. WHEELER |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED APPROVING COURT-APPOINTEE FEES -SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED APPROVING COURT-APPOINTEE FEES -SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE TO RUSSELL JAMES WHEELER AND DEVON LEE WHEELER TO RUSSELL JAMES WHEELER AND DEVON LEE WHEELER |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR CERTIFIED COPY - MAILED TO REQUESTED ADDRESS ON 10-6-2020 FOR CERTIFIED COPY - MAILED TO REQUESTED ADDRESS ON 10-6-2020 |
|
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT (OCA) 4 PAGES SIGNED ON 10-2-2020 4 PAGES SIGNED ON 10-2-2020 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.