Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Wells, Sasha Meshun, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Ana E. Estevez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT/S FILED EXHIBIT 1-3, 5-12 EXHIBIT 1-3, 5-12 |
|
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED ROBBY ROBBY |
|
July 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE ROBBY SCOTT-MAILED ROBBY SCOTT-MAILED |
|
July 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE E FILED TO GREG FREEMAN AND EDWARD NORFLEET E FILED TO GREG FREEMAN AND EDWARD NORFLEET |
|
July 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
DECREE OF DIVORCE (OCA) 7-19-17~18 PGS 7-19-17~18 PGS |
|
July 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED Signed Agreed Final Decree~SENT TO JUDGE PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED Signed Agreed Final Decree~SENT TO JUDGE |
|
July 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Final Divorce (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event | CITATION-AG SCOTT, ROBBY NEAL Served 07/15/2017 | |
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
ANSWER ATTORNEY AD LITEM EDWARD NORFLEET ATTORNEY AD LITEM EDWARD NORFLEET |
|
July 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
REQUEST CITATION TO BE ISSUED CITATION TO BE ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.