Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Betzen, Aaron, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Pro Se, against Trail Boss Ranch Cooking, Llc, Lambden, Roy L., in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Ana E. Estevez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 05, 2016 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY | |
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
AGREEMENT CLIENT AGREEMENT TO WITHDRAWAL CLIENT AGREEMENT TO WITHDRAWAL |
|
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ FROM ED MCCONNELL TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ FROM ED MCCONNELL |
|
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER ORDER TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL, SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ ORDER TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL, SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING 11/6/18 AT 9AM 501 S. FILLMORE STE. 4C AMARILLO, TX 11/6/18 AT 9AM 501 S. FILLMORE STE. 4C AMARILLO, TX |
|
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER ORDER SETTING HEARING, SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ ORDER SETTING HEARING, SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
October 10, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL | |
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING OF RECORDS & AFFIDAVITS AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE |
|
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING TRIAL SETTING FOR 6/25/18 AT 9:00AM TRIAL SETTING FOR 6/25/18 AT 9:00AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.