Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Copeland, Cyndia D., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Copeland, Race D., in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with John B. Board presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2016 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR CERTIFIED COPY-TO BE PICKED UP BY KELLY @ WADE BYRD'S OFFICE FOR CERTIFIED COPY-TO BE PICKED UP BY KELLY @ WADE BYRD'S OFFICE |
|
December 07, 2017 | Docket Event | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER | |
December 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED QDRO-SENT TO JUDGE BOARD PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED QDRO-SENT TO JUDGE BOARD |
|
November 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE E-FILED TO WADE BYRD AND LEN WALKER E-FILED TO WADE BYRD AND LEN WALKER |
|
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE SIGNED BY JUDGE BOARD 11-9-17 FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE SIGNED BY JUDGE BOARD 11-9-17 |
|
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Final Divorce (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Board, John B) | |
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
DECREE OF DIVORCE - AGREED (OCA) 11/09/17, 8 PAGES 11/09/17, 8 PAGES |
|
July 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO JUDGE BOARD FROM MEDIATOR WES WESTER REGARDING MEDIATION SETTLEMENT TO JUDGE BOARD FROM MEDIATOR WES WESTER REGARDING MEDIATION SETTLEMENT |
|
July 17, 2017 | Docket Event | MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
INVENTORY AND APRAISEMENT RESPONDENT'S RESPONDENT'S |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.