Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Brewer, Brett A., filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Graves, Krista Hope, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Ana E. Estevez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2016 |
CategoryParentage/Paternity |
Last RefreshedNovember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SIMMARY JUDG.-SUBMISSION (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
REPLY FATHER'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR NO EVIDENCE SUMMARY JUDGMENT FATHER'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR NO EVIDENCE SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING FOR MOTION FOR NO EVIDENCE SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY SUBMISSION FOR MOTION FOR NO EVIDENCE SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY SUBMISSION |
|
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER AGREED NOTICE OF COURT PROCEEDING FOR MOTION FOR NO EVIDENCE SUMMARY JUDGEMENT BY SUBMISSION - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ AGREED NOTICE OF COURT PROCEEDING FOR MOTION FOR NO EVIDENCE SUMMARY JUDGEMENT BY SUBMISSION - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE GRANDPARENTS RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR NO EVIDENCE SUMMARY JUDGMENT GRANDPARENTS RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR NO EVIDENCE SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
LETTER / VACATION SCHEDULE BRIAR WILCOX - 10-3-23 - 10-10-23 BRIAR WILCOX - 10-3-23 - 10-10-23 |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Per Judge CANCELED Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) Per Judge |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER ORDER ON MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ ORDER ON MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT NO EVIDENCE SUMMARY JUDGMENT NO EVIDENCE SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.