Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Shapiro Family Limited Partnership, filed a(n) Promissory Note - Creditor case represented by Grant Z Gibson, against Stiner, Robert, Knighton, Dale, Flow, F. Scott, represented by F. Scott Flow, Brian P. Heinrich, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with John B. Board presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2014 |
CategoryAccounts, Notes, And Contracts |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypePromissory Note |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE E-FILED TO GRANT Z. GIBSON AND F. SCOTT FLOW E-FILED TO GRANT Z. GIBSON AND F. SCOTT FLOW |
|
July 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR NONSUIT 6-30-17 1 pg 6-30-17 1 pg |
|
July 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT SIGNED BY JUDGE GLEASON 7-5-17 ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT SIGNED BY JUDGE GLEASON 7-5-17 |
|
June 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED GRANTING MOTION FOR NONSUIT-SENT TO JUDGE BOARD PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED GRANTING MOTION FOR NONSUIT-SENT TO JUDGE BOARD |
|
June 29, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR NONSUIT | |
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event | PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment partially granted as to the note, the holder of the note, the guarantor-Robert Stiner. All found and granted. Amount still and owing are still in controversy. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment partially granted as to the note, the holder of the note, the guarantor-Robert Stiner. All found and granted. Amount still and owing are still in controversy. |
|
February 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 3-20-17 @ 10:00 AM 3-20-17 @ 10:00 AM |
|
November 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
RECUSAL ORDER COPY OF THIS ORDER MAILED TO JUDGE MOORE 11-28-16 COPY OF THIS ORDER MAILED TO JUDGE MOORE 11-28-16 |
|
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SIMMARY JUDG.-SUBMISSION (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Board, John B) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.