Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Diaz, Alejandra, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Diaz, Manuel Flores, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with John B. Board presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 17, 2012 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Termination of Assignment and Child Support Servic | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PAYEE ATTORNEY GENERAL ATTORNEY GENERAL |
|
February 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
EMPLOYER LETTER W/W TEXAS PANHANDLE CENTERS TEXAS PANHANDLE CENTERS |
|
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event | REQUEST ISSUANCE OF WAGE ASSIGNMENT | |
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event | WAGE WITHHOLDING ORDER | |
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED WAGE WITHHOLDING ORDER-SENT TO JUDGE ANDERSON PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED WAGE WITHHOLDING ORDER-SENT TO JUDGE ANDERSON |
|
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGMENT FROM SDU FROM SDU |
|
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER AFFECTING PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP (OCA) 1-4-17 36 pgs~copy of order sent to SDU for CS 1-4-17 36 pgs~copy of order sent to SDU for CS |
|
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER AFFECTING P-C RELATIONSHIP SIGNED BY JUDGE GLEASON 1-4-17 ORDER AFFECTING P-C RELATIONSHIP SIGNED BY JUDGE GLEASON 1-4-17 |
|
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE E-FILED TO EDWARD NORFLEET AND JAMES CLARK E-FILED TO EDWARD NORFLEET AND JAMES CLARK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.