Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Williford, Amy Lou Russell, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Williford, Billy Dale, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with John B. Board presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn B. Board Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2004 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Termination of Assignment and Child Support Servic | |
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF ACCOUNT BILLY-DUE 4/9/19 BILLY-DUE 4/9/19 |
|
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER ADOPTING ASSOCIATE JUDGE'S REPORT-AG ADOPTING ASSOCIATE JUDGE'S REPORT-AG |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED PROPOSED ORDER ADOPTING ASSOCIATE JUDGE'S REPORT-SENT TO JUDGE BOARD 2/12/19 PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED PROPOSED ORDER ADOPTING ASSOCIATE JUDGE'S REPORT-SENT TO JUDGE BOARD 2/12/19 |
|
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
LETTER HEARING NOTICE HEARING NOTICE |
|
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF ACCOUNT BILLY-DUE 1/9/18 BILLY-DUE 1/9/18 |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Order signed, JFowler Associate Judge Order signed, JFowler Associate Judge |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER FINAL ORDER IN SUIT FOR MODIFICATION OF SUPPORT ORDER AND TO CONFIRM SUPPORT ARREARAGE FINAL ORDER IN SUIT FOR MODIFICATION OF SUPPORT ORDER AND TO CONFIRM SUPPORT ARREARAGE |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DE NOVO HEARING OR THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL REQUEST REQUEST FOR DE NOVO HEARING OR THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL |
|
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Hrg called: Ms. Cameron pro se sworn and testified, OAG Blackburn, Mr. Williford FTA; based on evidence rec'd Mr Williford incarcerated and child receives payment due to Mr. Willifords disability; order modified c/s to zero, Ms. Cameron still required to carry health insurance, Mr. Williford to reimburse costs of health insurance $213 per month, testimony revealed that Mr. Wiliford, despite incarceration, maintained an income of unknown amount due to sale of house, payment rec'd from lawsuit, and famililal gifts to him; order signed, JFowler Associate Judge Hrg called: Ms. Cameron pro se sworn and testified, OAG Blackburn, Mr. Williford FTA; based on evidence rec'd Mr Williford incarcerated and child receives payment due to Mr. Willifords disability; order modified c/s to zero, Ms. Cameron still required to carry health insurance, Mr. Williford to reimburse costs of health insurance $213 per month, testimony revealed that Mr. Wiliford, despite incarceration, maintained an income of unknown amount due to sale of house, payment rec'd from lawsuit, and famililal gifts to him; order signed, JFowler Associate Judge |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.