Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Berry, Brent Allen filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 07, 2024 |
CategoryLetters Of Testamentary |
Last RefreshedMarch 07, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Probate Hearing (3:45 PM) (Judicial Officers Dyer, Christy, Dyer, Christy) | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Citation PUBLIC, GENERAL Unserved | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Last Will and Testament ORIGINAL- HAND DELIVERED ORIGINAL- HAND DELIVERED |
|
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED POSTING- NEW APPLICANT POSTING- NEW APPLICANT |
|
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
AMENDED APPLICATION First Amended Application to Probate Will and for Issuance of Letters Testamentary- NEW APPLICANT First Amended Application to Probate Will and for Issuance of Letters Testamentary- NEW APPLICANT |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED POSTING POSTING |
|
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Citation PUBLIC, GENERAL Served 02/08/2024 | |
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Last Will and Testament E-FILE COPY E-FILE COPY |
|
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
APPLICATION TO PROBATE LETTERS TESTAMENTARY APPLICATION APPLICATION TO PROBATE LETTERS TESTAMENTARY |
|
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED POSTING POSTING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.