Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
White, Elizabeth, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Erwin, Marcy M., in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 108th District Court with Woodburn, Doug presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 24, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House108th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN/ATTORNEY AD LITEM ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM SIGNED ON 5/27/2021 BY JUDGE WOODBURN |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM signed. Kevin Isern apptd. |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY OR GUARDIAN AD LITEM MOTION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER DEFENDANT S ORIGINAL ANSWER (PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY) |
|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA) PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.