Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yellowhouse Machinery Co., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Brown, J. Daren, against Co-Counsel, Eaglehart Energy, Llc, represented by Taylor, B. Blaze, Esquire, Hoffman, Zachary P, in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 251st District Court with Estevez, Ana presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2018 |
CategorySuit On Sworn Account |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court House251st District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Judgment - Submission | |
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE, SIGNED ON 6/26/20, JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Continuance |
|
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS & MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE | |
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE ***THIS EVENTS DOCUMENT IS ATTACHEND TO THE EVENT BELOW*** NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS & MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE |
|
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER OR DOCUMENT RECEIVED BY CLERK FROM COURT UNSIGNED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL; UNSIGNED (SET FOR HEARING) |
|
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE Order Granting Withdrawal of Counsel |
|
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD MOTION TO WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL |
|
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING BY SUBMISSION; SET FOR 7/2/20 AT 9:00AM | |
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT PLAINTIFF'S Motion for Summary Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.