Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Arenivar, Oscar filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 320th District Court with Sirmon, Pamela presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 25, 2021 |
CategoryAg-Support Order/Suit Affecting |
Last RefreshedMarch 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court House320th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUIRING ATTENDANCE BY TELEPHONE OR VIDEO | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER SETTING HEARING SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Zoom: 2b reset none appeared |
|
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUIRING ATTENDANCE BY TELEPHONE OR VIDEO | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SETTING HEARING SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE VIA ZOOM |
|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Zoom: none appeared |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.