Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 108th District Court with Woodburn, Doug presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 16, 2021 |
CategoryAg-Support Order/Suit Affecting |
Last RefreshedMarch 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court House108th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Zoom: none appeared, |
|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUIRING ATTENDANCE BY TELEPHONE OR VIDEO | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SETTING HEARING SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE PROPOSED ORDER SETTING HEARING BY ZOOM |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Zoom: none appeared |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUIRING ATTENDANCE BY TELEPHONE OR VIDEO | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE VIA ZOOM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.