Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Aguilera, Caesar Jose filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 108th District Court with Woodburn, Doug presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 16, 2021 |
CategoryAg-Support Order/Suit Affecting |
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court House108th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Zoom: Mr. Aguilera served, FTA, in TDCJ, no answer, Ms. Collings pro se sworn and testified; OAG DePoyster to draft default order, JFowler |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER SETTING HEARING SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE | |
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUIRING ATTENDANCE BY TELEPHONE OR VIDEO | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Zoom: none appeared, NCP in TDCJ |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUIRING ATTENDANCE BY TELEPHONE OR VIDEO | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SETTING HEARING SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE PROPOSED ORDER SETTING FINA HEARING BY ZOOM.US |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.