Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law #2 with Hand, Matthew H. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law #2 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Case called as to OAG's OP/SAPCR - AOP for remote hrg per Covid 19 Emergency Orders & Court Guidance. OAG appeared thru atty, L. Neal by Zoom. Mo/Kimberly Lugo by Zoom. Fa/Arnaldo Lugo by Zoom. Rec by audio rec, SX-1 (updated Financial Record) admitted, parties reached agrmt and stipulated same on the record, judgment rendered per stipulated agrmt as follows: Fa owes MS arrears of $1505.41 as of 9/30/21, same reduced to judgment against Fa & Fa ordered to pay $25/mo to reduce the MS judgment. Support modified, Fa ordered to pay $650/514/399/mo CS + $25/mo CMS beg 12/1/21. Mo ordered to maintain med covg, govt source. Each parent ordered to pay 50% of unreimbursed medical costs. Inc WH. Fa ordered to pay the CC as billed by Potter Co. AG to draft & submit A/O Modify/Conf. pwt/vaj - by Judge Talley by Assignment |
|
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS FILED ELECTRONICALLY | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUIRING ATTENDANCE BY TELEPHONE OR VIDEO | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SETTING HEARING SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE ZOOM |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
TRANSFER IN MOTION (POST JUDGMENT FROM ANOTHER COUNTY) MOTION TO TRANSFER |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
TRANSFER IN FINAL ORDER (FROM ANOTHER COUNTY) ORDER EST. THE PCR AND SAPCR 11/1/2012 |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
TRANSFER IN FINAL ORDER (FROM ANOTHER COUNTY) ORDER TO TRANSFER FROM BEE CO. |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
TRANSFER IN-DOCUMENT NOTICE OF HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.