Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law #2 with Hand, Matthew H. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHand, Matthew H. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 02, 2021 |
CategoryAg-Support Order/Suit Affecting |
Last RefreshedMarch 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law #2 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUIRING ATTENDANCE BY TELEPHONE OR VIDEO | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SETTING HEARING SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE VIA ZOOM |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Zoom: none appeared |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CITATION JOSE FRANSISCO MARTINEZ SERVED 1/10/22 BY POTTER |
|
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
ISSUE AG - CITATION JOSE MARTINEZ |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CITATION JOSE MARTINEZ UNSERVED BY P/S |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.