Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 108th District Court with Woodburn, Doug presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWoodburn, Doug Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 31, 2021 |
CategoryAg-Support Order/Suit Affecting |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court House108th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Zoom: Ms. Olivarez appeared, 2b emailed order |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Agreed Order signed, hrg vacated; JFowler Associate Judge |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PARTY OF ORDER FILED | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
FINAL AGREED ORDER ORDER ESTABLISHING PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP / SIGNED 7-27-2021 |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE PROPOSED ORDER ESTABLISHING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | PATERNITY EVALUATION REPORT | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR PATERNITY TEST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.