Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 108th District Court with Woodburn, Doug presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryAg-Support Order/Suit Affecting |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court House108th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
FINAL ORDER PLAINTIFF DISMISSAL NONSUIT |
|
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Zoom Hearing: Ms. Burgos pro se, states she informed Mr. Segura about this; Mr. Segura did not appear; Ms. Burgos to submit California Order to OAG, OAG to review; case 2B reset for service |
|
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
April 14, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUIRING ATTENDANCE BY TELEPHONE OR VIDEO | |
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING/ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE | |
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | DOCKET ENTRY | |
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CITATION TABITHA BURGOS SERVED 01/17/2020 BY POTTER |
|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | ISSUE AG - CITATION | |
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING/ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.