Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law #1 with Weaver, Walt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryAg-Support Order/Suit Affecting |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law #1 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Agreed Order signed, see also 93907EFM JFowler Associate Judge |
|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
FINAL AGREED ORDER ORDER IN SUIT AFFECTING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP SIGNED 03/11/2020 |
|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PARTY OF ORDER FILED | |
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CITATION CHELSIE RODGERS SERVED 02/11/2020 BY POTTER CO |
|
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CITATION JOSE LUIS SANDOVAL SERVED 1-30-2020 BY POTTER CO. |
|
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
ISSUE AG - CITATION JOSE SANDOVAL AND CHELSIE RODGERS |
|
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING/ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER SETTING HEARING SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) ORIGINAL PETITION IN SUIT AFFECTING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.