Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) Paternity - Family case in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 320th District Court with Sirmon, Pamela presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2019 |
CategoryAg-Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Filing Court House320th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
FINAL ORDER ORDER ESTABLSIHING THE PARENT CHILD RELATIONSHIP SIGNED ON 5/18/2020 |
|
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PARTY OF ORDER FILED | |
May 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Order signed, JFowler Associate Judge |
|
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE /ORDER ESTABLISHING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP |
|
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Zoom hearing called: Mr. Perales interpreter, OAG Leger, Mr. Edgar Hernandez pro se sworn and testified, Ms Margarita Hernandez Saldana pro se sworn and testified, orders rendered and signed, JFowler Associate Judge |
|
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY all parties appeared on Zoom, negotiations fail, reset for next week, May 13 9:30 |
|
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Ms. Shelly Flores told the parties |
|
April 14, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUIRING ATTENDANCE BY TELEPHONE OR VIDEO | |
March 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CITATION EDGAR MUNOZ SERVED 03/11/2020 BY POTTER COUNTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.