Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 108th District Court with Woodburn, Doug presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2019 |
CategoryAg-Support Order/Suit Affecting |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court House108th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event | TERMINATION NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT AND CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES | |
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PARTY OF ORDER FILED | |
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO RESPONDENT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT ORDER ESTABLISHING THE PARENT-CHILD RELAITONSHIP / SIGNED 05-16-2020 |
|
May 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Order signed, JFowler Associate Judge |
|
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE ORDER ESTABLISHING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP |
|
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Hrg called on Zoom: OAG Leger, Ms. Gomez-Garcia pro se sworn and testified, Mr. Richad Perales certified interpreter; Mr. Palacios in TDCJ served, FTA; order rendered and signed, JFowler Associate Judge |
|
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
May 06, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
April 21, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUIRING ATTENDANCE BY TELEPHONE OR VIDEO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.