Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) Paternity - Family case in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 108th District Court with Woodburn, Doug presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2018 |
CategoryAg-Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Filing Court House108th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PARTY OF ORDER FILED | |
April 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
FINAL AGREED ORDER ORDER ESTABLISHING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP AND IN SUIT AFFECTING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP SIGNED 04/16/19 |
|
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Agreed Order signed, JFowler Associate Judge |
|
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CITATION JOSAFAT RODRIGUEZ SERVED 03/06/19 BY POTTER |
|
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
RESPONDENT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER JOSAFAT RODRIGUEZ |
|
February 13, 2019 | Docket Event | ISSUE AG - CITATION | |
February 13, 2019 | Docket Event | RESET ORDER | |
February 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Ms. Jaimes, who speaks spanish appeared, reset for service 4/16/19 1:30 |
|
February 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.