Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) Paternity - Family case in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 108th District Court with Woodburn, Doug presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2018 |
CategoryAg-Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Filing Court House108th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO RESPONDENT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT ORDER ESTABLISHING THE PARENT CHILD RELATIONSHIP SIGNED ON 6/4/19 |
|
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Hrg called on May 13, sworn testimony rec'd, OAG Estrada, Mr. Phouthakhio served, FTA, submitted to paternity testing, case taken under advisement, once odyssey back up, order signed today, JFowler Associate Judge |
|
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event | PATERNITY EVALUATION REPORT | |
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ANOU ANDREW PHOUTHAKHIO |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY PTO 5/13/19 2:30, Ms. Torres appeared, |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR PATERNITY TEST | |
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CITATION JADE TORRES SERVED 1/22/19 BY RANDALL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.