Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 320th District Court with Emerson, Don presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2018 |
CategoryAg-Support Order/Suit Affecting |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court House320th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
FINAL AGREED ORDER ORDER IN SUIT AFFECTING THE PARENT CHILD RELATIONSHIP SIGNED ON 12/20/18 |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Agreed Order signed, Feb. Hearing vacated; JFowler Associate Judge |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PARTY OF ORDER FILED | |
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE PROPOSED ORDER IN SUIT AFFECTING THE PARENT CHILD RELATIONSHIP |
|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING/ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE | |
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event | FAMILY COVER SHEET | |
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) ORIGINAL PETITION IN SUIT AFFECTING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP (AOP) |
|
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER SETTING HEARING SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.