Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Aguero, Priscilla Ann filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Gomez, Darion Leigh, in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 108th District Court with Woodburn, Doug presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2018 |
CategoryAg-Support Order/Suit Affecting |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court House108th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO RESPONDENT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT ORDER ESTABLISHING TH PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP SIGNED ON 4/15/19 |
|
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PARTY OF ORDER FILED | |
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Hrg called: Ms. Aguero pro se sworn and testified, Ms. Gomez served FTA, Mr. Cordero served FTA; orders rendered and signed JFowler Associate Judge |
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CITATION DARION GOMEZ SERVED 02/28/19 BY DEAF SMITH CO |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CITATION DARION GOMEZ UNSERVED BY DEAF SMITH |
|
February 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
ISSUE AG - CITATION DARION GOMEZ |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY 4/15/19 1:30, Ms. Aguero appeared, Ms. Gomez still not served |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.