Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) Paternity - Family case in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 108th District Court with Woodburn, Doug presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWoodburn, Doug Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2018 |
CategoryAg-Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Filing Court House108th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
FINAL ORDER PLAINTIFF DISMISSAL NOTICE OF NONSUIT |
|
June 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY OAG ann'd nonsuit |
|
June 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING/ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE | |
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY NO ONE APPEARED - RESET 6-10-19 AT 1:30 |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR PATERNITY TEST | |
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE | |
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Ms. Ford present. PTO 4/9/49 8:30 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.