Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 108th District Court with Woodburn, Doug presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2018 |
CategoryAg-Support Order/Suit Affecting |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court House108th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PARTY OF ORDER FILED | |
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
FINAL AGREED ORDER ORDER IN SUIT AFFECTING THE PARENT CHILD RELATIONSHIP SIGNED 05/08/19 |
|
May 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Agreed Order signed, JFowler Associate Judge |
|
May 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING/ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE | |
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY NO ONE APPEARED - RESET 5-8-19 AT 1:30 |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CITATION BLAKE MYRICK UNSERVED BY HOPKINS |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event | RESET ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.