Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) Paternity - Family case in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 108th District Court with Woodburn, Doug presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2018 |
CategoryAg-Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Filing Court House108th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PARTY OF ORDER FILED | |
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
FINAL AGREED ORDER ORDER ESTABLISHING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP / SIGNED 2-5-19 |
|
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Agreed Order signed--JFowler Associate Judge (private DNA performed) |
|
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
LETTER FR: MICHAEL STOTTS RE: SOLIDIFY RIGHTS AS PATERNAL PARENT |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CITATION MICHAEL STOTTS SERVED 12-13-18 BY PCSO - $75 FEE |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CITATION AZELLA BALDWIN SERVED 12/14/18 BY LUBBOCK CO NO FEE LISTED |
|
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event | ISSUE AG - CITATION | |
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER SETTING HEARING SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE | |
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event | FAMILY COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.